Oklahoma Northern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00040
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:15 AM CDT
Defendant
Adrian Beltran Moreno (1)
Represented By
Robert Allen Ridenour
Federal Public Defender'S Office (tulsa)
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Perez-Gil (2)
Represented By
Cheryl Minnix Thigpen
Thigpen Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David Nasar
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 2:44 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
1 1 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET(S) by USA as to Adrian Beltran Moreno, Carlos Perez-Gil (pll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 SEALED INDICTMENT by USA as to Adrian Beltran Moreno (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, Carlos Perez-Gil (2) count(s) 1 (pll, Dpty Clk) Modified on 3/24/2025 Defendants name corrected by interlineation per21 to reflect the name of First name: Adrian Last name: Beltran Moreno (tjc, Dpty Clk).
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED UNREDACTED VERSION of Dkt #2 per FRCrP 49.1(f) (pll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]