5
|
|
5
Order to Show Cause. By May 16, 2025, plaintiff shall either submit an application to proceed in district court without prepaying fees or costs or pay the appropriate filing fee. Plaintiff shall show cause in writing why the case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 5/2/2025. (SS)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued Standing Orders, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/24/2025. (CKS)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
ORDER directing plaintiff that on or before April 24, 2025, he shall either complete and file the enclosed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) or pay the $405 filing fee. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 4/10/2025.(SS)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form)
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Kazarian Purcell (e-portal). (BD)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit 1
|