Original Case: 1:25-cv-00665

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01756
Typecivil / us / social security
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:31 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
LELAND DUDEK, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By
Elisa F. Donohoe
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AUGUSTUS B. GAINES
Represented By
Augustus B. Gaines
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
AUGUSTUS B. GAINES, JR.
Represented By
Augustus B. Gaines Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 4:07 AM CDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
1 1 U.S. civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellants Augustus B. Gaines and Augustus B. Gaines Jr. by 05/05/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/16/2025. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/16/2025 for Appellants Augustus B. Gaines and Augustus B. Gaines Jr. [1] [7450122] 25-1756 (PS) [Entered: 05/02/2025 02:23 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
Att: 4 2 pgs Fee Notice