Original Case: 1:22-cv-01147

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01273
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2024
Terminated:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:32 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellant
PORTERCARE ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEMS, a Colorado corporation d/b/a Centura Health-Porter Adventist Hospital
Represented By
Carrie Maylor DiCanio
Anderson Kill & Olick
contact info
Marshall N. Gilinsky
Anderson Kill
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
ADHEALTH, LIMITED
Represented By
Sara J. Brundage
Honigman
contact info
Jane Elizabeth Young
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Eric Toepfer
Honigman
contact info
Michelle Yang
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 4:32 AM MDT
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
[11100622] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/25/2024 Docketing statement due 07/10/2024 for PorterCare Adventist Health Systems. Transcript order form due 07/10/2024 for PorterCare Adventist Health Systems. Notice of appearance due on 07/10/2024 for Adhealth, Limited and PorterCare Adventist Health Systems. Disclosure statement due on 07/10/2024 for Adhealth, Limited and PorterCare Adventist Health Systems 24-1273
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil