Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:25-bk-15027
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Claims Deadline:Jul 14, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Clearing Bank
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
M.I.S. Commodities, Inc.
401 E Atlantic Ave Ste 103
Delray Beach, FL 33483-4536
Represented By
Adam I Skolnik
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
18 18 court Notice of Hearing (BK) Tue 05/13 2:36 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Chapter 11 Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2025 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-] 16 Application to Employ Adam I. Skolnik, Esq. as General Bankruptcy Counsel for Debtor In Possession [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor M.I.S. Commodities, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Retainer Agreement # 3 Proposed Order)
Monday, May 12, 2025
17 17 misc Case Management Summary Mon 05/12 10:54 PM
Ch 11 Case Management Summary Filed by Debtor M.I.S. Commodities, Inc.. (Skolnik, Adam)
Related: [-]
16 16 5 pgs motion Employ Mon 05/12 2:19 PM
Application to Employ Adam I. Skolnik, Esq. as General Bankruptcy Counsel for Debtor In Possession [Affidavit Attached] Filed by Debtor M.I.S. Commodities, Inc. (Skolnik, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Retainer Agreement
Att: 3 Proposed Order
15 15 misc Tax Return Documents Mon 05/12 1:45 PM
Federal Income Tax Return of Debtor. [ Document Image Available ONLY to Court Users ] Filed by Debtor M.I.S. Commodities, Inc.. (Skolnik, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2023 Tax Return
14 14 misc Chapter 11 Small Business - All Financial Documents Mon 05/12 1:42 PM
Financial Documents Required of Chapter 11 Small Business [Cash Flow Statement, Balance Sheet and Statement of Operations] Filed by Debtor M.I.S. Commodities, Inc. Related [+]. (Skolnik, Adam)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Deficiency
Att: 1 (a)Balance Sheet (b)State of Operation or Statement (c)Cash Flow Statement
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b). Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c), the Debtor Must File a Report no Later than 14 days Before the Date of the Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 06/25/2025 at 01:30 PM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Leonard, Dawn)
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice of Incomplete Filings Due Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 5/12/2025].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 5/12/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/19/2025. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/19/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/19/2025. Schedule D due 5/19/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/19/2025. Schedule G due 5/19/2025. Schedule H due 5/19/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/19/2025. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/19/2025. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/19/2025].
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Fleurimond, Lucie)
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 05/08 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 05/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/5/2025 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Proofs of Claim due by 7/14/2025.
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference Tue 05/06 7:35 AM
Order Setting Subchapter V Status Conference, Claims Bar Date, and Deadline for Elections Under 11 U.S.C. § 1111(b). Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1188(c), the Debtor Must File a Report no Later than 14 days Before the Date of the Status Conference. Status hearing to be held on 06/25/2025 at 01:30 PM Flagler Waterview Building, 1515 N Flagler Dr Room 801 Courtroom B, West Palm Beach, FL, 33401. (Leonard, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
8 8 court Meeting of Creditors 11 Mon 05/05 2:26 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors to be Held on 6/5/2025 at 09:00 AM by TELEPHONE [See Meeting Notice for details]. Proofs of Claim due by 7/14/2025. (Fleurimond, Lucie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice UST Notice Appointing Trustee Mon 05/05 2:19 PM
Notice Appointing Tarek Kirk Kiem as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.(Feinman, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement
6 6 utility Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency [ECF] Mon 05/05 1:55 PM
Notice to Filer of Apparent Filing Deficiency: Incorrect Case Number 25-14846 BKC-EPK) Indicated on PDF Image. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO FILE AN AMENDED **DOCUMENT** WITHIN TWO BUSINESS DAYS. Related [+] (Fleurimond, Lucie)
Related: [-] 5 Notice Appointing Tarek Kirk Kiem as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Verified Statement)
5 5 notice UST Notice Appointing Trustee Mon 05/05 12:52 PM
Notice Appointing Tarek Kirk Kiem as Subchapter V Trustee . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the US Trustee.(Feinman, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement
4 4 1 pgs order Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business Mon 05/05 12:28 PM
Order Authorizing Debtor in Possession to Continue Operation of its Business, Close Pre-Petition Bank Accounts, and Open Debtor in Possession Bank Accounts . (Fleurimond, Lucie)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Notice of Deficiency Mon 05/05 12:24 PM
Notice of Incomplete Filings Due Required Chapter 11 Case Management Summary. Chapter 11 debtors (other than individuals not engaged in business) must file Local Form "Chapter 11 Case Management Summary" on the earlier of three business days after the petition date, or one business day before the first scheduled hearing on any motion. [See Local Rule 2081-1(B)]. [Deficiency Must be Cured by 5/12/2025].Chapter 11 Small Business Documents and/or Subchapter V due by 5/12/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/19/2025. Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 5/19/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/19/2025. Schedule D due 5/19/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/19/2025. Schedule G due 5/19/2025. Schedule H due 5/19/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Due 5/19/2025. Declaration Concerning Debtors Schedules Due: 5/19/2025. [Incomplete Filings due by 5/19/2025]. (Fleurimond, Lucie)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 05/05 8:25 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor M.I.S. Commodities, Inc.. (Skolnik, Adam)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Mon 05/05 8:25 AM
Chapter 11 SubchapterV Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1738] Proofs of Claim due by 07/14/2025. (Skolnik, Adam)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 05/05 8:30 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-15027 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number B45998861. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]