Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Melissa R Dubose
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:25-cv-00195
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Detainee
Case Filed:May 05, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
16 16 misc Transcript Mon 05/19 3:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Emergency Application for a TRO held on 05/07/2025 before District Judge Melissa R. DuBose. Court Reporter Denise A Webb, Telephone number 401-752-7045. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option . Redaction Request due 6/9/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/20/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/18/2025. (Webb, Denise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/15 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Ross on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Miron Bloom on behalf of All Defendants (Bloom, Sara)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
13 13 misc Transcript Order Acknowledgment (Form Attached) Mon 05/12 9:18 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re:12 Transcript Order,. Daily Transcript Ordered. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Webb. (Dias, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 misc Transcript Order Fri 05/09 6:00 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/7/2025 before Judge Melissa R. DuBose. Daily Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered following adjournment and prior to the normal opening hour of court on the following morning.. (Ngo, My Khanh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 5:19 PM
AMENDED ORDER REQUIRING ADVANCED NOTICE BEFORE MOVING PETITIONER entered. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 5/7/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 9:25 AM
NOTICE by G.M.G. re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order of Additional Authority(Deyoe, Sonja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
minutes Motion Hearing Wed 05/07 5:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Melissa R. DuBose: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2025 re2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by G.M.G.. (My.K. Ngo, S.M. Bloom) Arguments heard. The Court amends order re notice (clerk to file). Recess. (Court Reporter Denise Webb in Courtroom Zoom at 4:00 PM) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 1:02 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ADVANCED NOTICE BEFORE MOVING PETITIONER entered. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 5/5/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/05 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lynette J. Labinger on behalf of G.M.G. (Labinger, Lynette)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 9:21 AM
MOTION for My Khanh Ngo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2130557 ) filed by G.M.G.. (Deyoe, Sonja)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 9:20 AM
MOTION for Lee Gelernt to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2130556 ) filed by G.M.G.. (Deyoe, Sonja)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 9:18 AM
MOTION for Daniel Galindo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2130555 ) filed by G.M.G.. (Deyoe, Sonja)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed Under a Pseudonym Mon 05/05 9:04 AM
MOTION to Proceed Under a Pseudonym filed by G.M.G.. Responses due by 5/19/2025.(Deyoe, Sonja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 05/05 9:02 AM
Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by G.M.G..(Deyoe, Sonja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Memorandum,
Att: 2 Affidavit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
1 1 motion Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus-New Case Mon 05/05 8:30 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number ARIDC-2130514.), filed by G MG.(Deyoe, Sonja)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons,
Att: 10 Summons,
Att: 11 Summons,
Att: 12 Summons,
Att: 13 Summons,
Att: 14 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/05 8:43 AM
Case assigned to District Judge Melissa R. DuBose and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 10:46 AM
TEXT ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel Galindo. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 5/5/2025. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 10:52 AM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Lee P. Gelernt. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 5/5/2025. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 05/05 10:58 AM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of My Khanh Ngo. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 5/5/2025. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Mon 05/05 1:41 PM
Related: [-]
NOTICE of Hearing re2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order set for 5/7/2025 at 4:00 PM by Remote Hearing before District Judge Melissa R. DuBose. See the Court's public website for access to hearing.
Related: [-]