Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:25-cv-00194
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Case in other court:California Central, 2:24-cv-10995
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 11:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Stand Out for Good, Inc.
Represented By
Maria R. Sinatra
Venable LLP
contact info
Alexandra Lee Kolsky
Venable LLP
contact info
Marcella Ballard
Venable LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Deckers Outdoor Corporation
Represented By
Brent H Blakely
Brent H. Blakely
contact info
Jamie Fountain
Blakely Law Group
contact info
Iain Austin Hill
Blakely Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
34 34 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Mon 05/05 10:50 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/5/2025. c/m Alexandra Lee Kolsky, Venable LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300, Los Angeles, CA 90067; Iain Austin Hill, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Jamie Fountain, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Marcella Ballard, Venable LLP, 151 West 42nd Street, Ste 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036; Maria R. Sinatra, Venable LLP, Intellectual Property, 151 West 42nd Street 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036. (MKM)
Related: [-]
33 33 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Mon 05/05 10:49 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/5/2025. c/m Alexandra Lee Kolsky, Venable LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300, Los Angeles, CA 90067; Iain Austin Hill, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Jamie Fountain, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Marcella Ballard, Venable LLP, 151 West 42nd Street, Ste 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036; Maria R. Sinatra, Venable LLP, Intellectual Property, 151 West 42nd Street 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036. (MKM)
Related: [-]
32 32 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Mon 05/05 10:48 AM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 5/5/2025. c/m Alexandra Lee Kolsky, Venable LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300, Los Angeles, CA 90067; Iain Austin Hill, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Jamie Fountain, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Marcella Ballard, Venable LLP, 151 West 42nd Street, Ste 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036; Maria R. Sinatra, Venable LLP, Intellectual Property, 151 West 42nd Street 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036. (MKM)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Mon 05/05 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to B. Blakely. (MKM)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Mon 05/05 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). c/m Alexandra Lee Kolsky, Venable LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300, Los Angeles, CA 90067; Iain Austin Hill, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Jamie Fountain, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Marcella Ballard, Venable LLP, 151 West 42nd Street, Ste 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036; Maria R. Sinatra, Venable LLP, Intellectual Property, 151 West 42nd Street 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036. (MKM)
Related: [-]
29 29 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 05/05 10:20 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:24-cv-10995.
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Mon 05/05 10:38 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by All Parties. c/m Alexandra Lee Kolsky, Venable LLP, 2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300, Los Angeles, CA 90067; Iain Austin Hill, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Jamie Fountain, Blakely Law Group, 1334 Parkview Avenue, Suite 280, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266; Marcella Ballard, Venable LLP, 151 West 42nd Street, Ste 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036; Maria R. Sinatra, Venable LLP, Intellectual Property, 151 West 42nd Street 49th Floor, New York, NY 10036. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
27 27 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER OF ACTION26 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This action is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Tennessee, Northern Division; Upon transfer, Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint; and Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the SAC within 45 days after it is filed. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
26 26 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee, Northern Division filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc..(Ballard, Marcella) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 11, 2025
25 25 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT24 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The time for Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc. to respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended through and including April 30, 2025. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
24 24 4 pgs Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 30, 2025 re Amended Complaint/Petition22 filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc..(Kolsky, Alexandra) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 03, 2025
23 23 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On the Court's motion and in light of the filing of the First Amended Complaint, the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim20 is denied as moot. The hearing set for April 21, 2025 is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
22 22 31 pgs First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Stand Out for Good, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation(Blakely, Brent) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, March 31, 2025
21 21 2 pgs Notice INTENT TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
20 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Improper Venue, and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Kolsky, Alexandra) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration Maria Sinatra with Exhibits A-H,
Att: 3 Declaration Victoria Lea Whited,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT18 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The time for Defendant Stand Out For Good, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED through and including March 12, 2025. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
18 18 4 pgs Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 3/12/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc..(Kolsky, Alexandra) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting16 Non-Resident Attorney Maria R. Sinatra APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc., designating Alexandra Kolsky as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
16 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maria R. Sinatra to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39005078) filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc.. (Kolsky, Alexandra) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
15 15 1 pgs ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The time for Defendant Stand Out For Good, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is extended through and including February 24, 2025. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 4 pgs Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 2/24/2025 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc..(Kolsky, Alexandra) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
13 13 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: granting11 Non-Resident Attorney Marcella Ballard APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc, designating Alexandra Kolsky as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 2 pgs PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, upon Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc. served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon PAULETTE STROUP-Process Receiver in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Fountain, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Marcella Ballard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38893122) filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc.. (Kolsky, Alexandra) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc., (Attorney Alexandra Lee Kolsky added to party Stand Out for Good, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kolsky, Alexandra) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 22, 2024
9 9 2 pgs 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Stand Out for Good, Inc. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 2 pgs Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation, identifying Plaintiff-Deckers Outdoor Corporation; Defendant-Stand Out for Good, Inc.. (Fountain, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Fountain, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38800184 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Deckers Outdoor Corporation. (Attorney Jamie Fountain added to party Deckers Outdoor Corporation(pty:pla))(Fountain, Jamie) [Transferred from California Central on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2