Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:25-cv-00465
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Case in other court:Texas Western, 1:24-cv-01511
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 10:06 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
BambuLab Limited
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Claimant
BambuLab USA, Inc.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Claimant
Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Claimant
Tuozhu Technology Limited
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Claimant
Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Claimant
Stratasys, Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Kevin James Meek
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Aashish Gautam Kapadia
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Andrea Leigh Fair
Miller Fair Henry PLLC
contact info
Syed Kamil Fareed
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Brian W Oaks
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Christian Taylor Tatum
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Counter Defendant
BambuLab Limited
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Defendant
BambuLab USA, Inc.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Defendant
Tuozhu Technology Limited
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Defendant
Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Counter Defendant
Stratasys, Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Kevin James Meek
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Aashish Gautam Kapadia
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Andrea Leigh Fair
Miller Fair Henry PLLC
contact info
Syed Kamil Fareed
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Brian W Oaks
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Christian Taylor Tatum
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Defendant
Stratasys, Inc.
Represented By
Deron R Dacus
The Dacus Firm, PC
contact info
Kevin James Meek
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Aashish Gautam Kapadia
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Andrea Leigh Fair
Miller Fair Henry PLLC
contact info
Syed Kamil Fareed
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Brian W Oaks
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Christian Taylor Tatum
Mcdermott Will & Emery
contact info
Plaintiff
Tuozhu Technology Limited
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co. Ltd.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
BambuLab USA, Inc.
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
BambuLab Limited
Represented By
Carl Edward Bruce
Fish & Richardson - Carl Bruce
contact info
Gregory Phillip Love
Steckler Wayne Cherry & Love, PLLC
contact info
David M Barkan
Fish & Richardson Pc - Redwood City
contact info
Thomas Howard Reger, II
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Aaron P Pirouznia
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info
Ruffin B Cordell
Fish & Richardson Pc - Washington Dc
contact info
Brandon Scott Avers
Fish & Richardson P.C.
contact info
Michael Alden Vincent
Fish & Richardson P.C. - Dallas
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
43 43 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Mon 05/05 9:30 AM
Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:24-cv-01511. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Pursuant to LR CV-7(j)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/05 4:02 PM
Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (mdj)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Mon 05/05 4:03 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mdj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
42 42 Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
41 41 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's17 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
40 40 ORDER CANCELLING MOTIONS HEARING VIA ZOOM . Motions Hearing via Zoom set for 5/1/2025 at 9:30 A.M. is hereby CANCELLED until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
39 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ruffin B. Cordell on behalf of BambuLab Limited, BambuLab USA, Inc., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Tuozhu Technology Limited. Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party BambuLab Limited(pty:cd), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party BambuLab Limited(pty:cc), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party BambuLab Limited(pty:pla), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party BambuLab USA, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party BambuLab USA, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party BambuLab USA, Inc.(pty:cc), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:cd), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:cc), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:cd), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd.(pty:cc), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Tuozhu Technology Limited(pty:cd), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Tuozhu Technology Limited(pty:cc), Attorney Ruffin B. Cordell added to party Tuozhu Technology Limited(pty:pla) (Cordell, Ruffin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
37 37 ORDER Setting Hearing on17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule or, in the alternative, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) : Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright,. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (pg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
38 38 ORDER Setting Hearing via Zoom on17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule or, in the alternative, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) : Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2025 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (pg) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
36 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: Notice Concerning Reference to a Magistrate due by 7/9/2026, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2026 in Austin before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/5/2026 in Austin before Judge Alan D Albright, Markman Hearing set for 10/6/2025 at 9:00 A.M. in Austin before Judge Alan D Albright, Amended Pleadings due by 1/22/2026, Joinder of Parties due by 11/13/2025, and Dispositive Motions due by 7/9/2026. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
35 35 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by BambuLab Limited, BambuLab USA, Inc., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Tuozhu Technology Limited.(Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
34 34 STATUS REPORT : Case Readiness Status Report by BambuLab Limited, BambuLab USA, Inc., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Tuozhu Technology Limited. (Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's[LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings (OGP) - Patent Cases] . (bot4) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
33 33 ORDER; the parties are hereby ORDERED to jointly file the Case Readiness and Status Report (CRSR) withing (7) days after this Order is docketed. The parties shall then have twenty-eight (28) days from the date the CRSR is filed to file a motion to enter an agreed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
32 32 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS IN REPLY ANSWER to29 Answer to Counterclaim,,, by Stratasys, Inc..(Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
31 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
30 30 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Stratasys, Inc., re17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule or, in the alternative, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) filed by Defendant Stratasys, Inc.(Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tatum Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
29 29 41 pgs ANSWER to23 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, , COUNTERCLAIM against Stratasys, Inc. by Tuozhu Technology Limited, BambuLab Limited, BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd..(Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
28 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule or, in the alternative, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) by Stratasys, Inc..(Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Text Order GRANTING28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant file a reply in support of its Motion to Transfer on or before March 18, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cslc) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
27 27 27 pgs Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by BambuLab Limited, BambuLab USA, Inc., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Tuozhu Technology Limited, re17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule or, in the alternative, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) filed by Defendant Stratasys, Inc.(Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of David M. Barkan,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Proposed Order
Monday, February 24, 2025
26 26 ORDER GRANTING22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christian Taylor Tatum for Stratasys, Inc.,Christian Taylor Tatum for Stratasys, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
25 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Stratasys, Inc. (Fair, Andrea) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
24 24 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Stratasys, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Stratasys Solutions Ltd., Corporate Parent Stratasys Ltd. for Stratasys, Inc.. (Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
23 23 80 pgs ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against BambuLab Limited, BambuLab USA, Inc., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Tuozhu Technology Limited by Stratasys, Inc..(Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10
22 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin J. Meek on behalf of Christian T. Tatum ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19805687) by on behalf of Stratasys, Inc.. (Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
21 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deron R Dacus on behalf of Stratasys, Inc.. Attorney Deron R Dacus added to party Stratasys, Inc.(pty:dft) (Dacus, Deron) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aashish G. Kapadia on behalf of Stratasys, Inc.. Attorney Aashish G. Kapadia added to party Stratasys, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kapadia, Aashish) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
19 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Syed K. Fareed on behalf of Stratasys, Inc.. Attorney Syed K. Fareed added to party Stratasys, Inc.(pty:dft) (Fareed, Syed) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
18 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian W. Oaks on behalf of Stratasys, Inc.. Attorney Brian W. Oaks added to party Stratasys, Inc.(pty:dft) (Oaks, Brian) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Texas Pursuant to the First-to-File Rule or, in the alternative, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) by Stratasys, Inc..(Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Tatum Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C
16 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin J. Meek on behalf of Stratasys, Inc.. Attorney Kevin J. Meek added to party Stratasys, Inc.(pty:dft) (Meek, Kevin) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
14 14 ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jessica H. Wang for BambuLab Limited,Jessica H. Wang for BambuLab USA, Inc.,Jessica H. Wang for Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd.,Jessica H. Wang for Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd.,Jessica H. Wang for Tuozhu Technology Limited. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Menglin Sun for BambuLab Limited,Menglin Sun for BambuLab USA, Inc.,Menglin Sun for Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd.,Menglin Sun for Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd.,Menglin Sun for Tuozhu Technology Limited. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Vincent re Jessica H. Wang ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19685572) by on behalf of BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab Limited, Tuozhu Technology Limited. (Vincent, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Vincent re Menglin Sun ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19685568) by on behalf of BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab Limited, Tuozhu Technology Limited. (Vincent, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Designation of Lead Counsel by BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab Limited, Tuozhu Technology Limited (Bruce, Carl) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
9 9 ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BRANDON S. AVERS. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tuozhu Technology Limited, BambuLab Limited, Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd. as to Stratasys, Inc.. Waiver sent on 12/20/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. (Barkan, David) Modified on 12/20/2024 to edit service date (cnr). [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
7 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael A. Vincent for Brandon S. Avers ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19595730) by on behalf of BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab Limited, Tuozhu Technology Limited. (Vincent, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
6 6 Summons Issued as to Stratasys, Inc.. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Brandon S. Avers. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
4 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab Limited, Tuozhu Technology Limited identifying Corporate Parent Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd. for BambuLab Limited, BambuLab USA, Inc., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., Tuozhu Technology Limited. (Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab Limited, Tuozhu Technology Limited. (Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19559390), filed by Tuozhu Technology Limited, BambuLab Limited, Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd..(Barkan, David) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BambuLab USA, Inc., Shenzhen Tuozhu Technology Co., Ltd., Shanghai Lunkuo Technology Co., Ltd., BambuLab Limited, Tuozhu Technology Limited. (kp) [Transferred from Texas Western on 5/5/2025.]
Related: [-]