Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. De Los Santos et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | J Paul Oetken |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-03724 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity Action |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 2:05 PM EDT |
Defendant
Commissioner of Labor of the State of New York
|
|
Defendant
Jesus De Los Santos
|
|
Defendant
Household Finance Realty Corporation of New York
|
|
Defendant
M-913 Auto Corp.
|
|
Defendant
New York City Criminal Court
|
|
Defendant
New York City Department of Housing Preservation & Development
|
|
Defendant
New York City Environmental Control Board
|
|
Defendant
New York City Parking Violations Bureau
|
|
Defendant
New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau
|
|
Defendant
New York State Department of Taxation And Finance
|
|
Defendant
New York State Tax Compliance Division-Child Support
|
|
Defendant
State of New York-Department of Law
|
|
Defendant
THE CITY OF NEW YORK
|
|
Defendant
Workers' Compensation Board of New York State
|
|
Plaintiff
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() ORDER : Counsel for all parties are directed to appear telephonically for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on August 11, 2025 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel should call (855) 244-8681 at the scheduled time. The attendee ID number is 23128287066. Counsel are directed to confer with each other prior to the conference regarding settlement and each of the other subjects to be considered at a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 conference. Counsel are further directed to use the Court's Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order form (the "Form") to jointly prepare a detailed written proposed schedule for any motions and discovery. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 8/11/2025 at 03:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/7/25) (yv) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City Of New York, Commissioner of Labor of the State of New York, Jesus De Los Santos, Household Finance Realty Corporation of New York, M-913 Auto Corp., New York City Criminal Court, New York City Department of Housing Preservation & Development, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, New York State Department of Taxation And Finance, New York State Tax Compliance Division-Child Support, State of New York-Department of Law, Workers' Compensation Board of New York State..(pc) |
|
5 | 5
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Aktingesellschaft (Deutsche Bank AG), a publicly held corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company..(Krapf, Jamie) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/06 9:50 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Jamie C. Krapf to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): not all corporate parents/other affiliates were added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 05/06 11:58 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 05/06 11:59 AM
Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 05/06 11:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 05/06 11:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jamie C. Krapf. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Tue 05/06 11:59 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jamie C. Krapf. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8, THE CITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc) |
||
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank Aktingesellschaft (Deutsche Bank AG), a publicly held corporation for Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8..(Krapf, Jamie) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Krapf, Jamie) |
|
2 | 2
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JESUS DE LOS SANTOS A/K/A JESUS MARIA DE LOS SANTOS A/K/A JESUS MARIA DE LOS SANTO; M-913 AUTO CORP. A/K/A M913 AUTO CORP.; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE REALTY CORPORATION OF NEW YORK; NEW YORK STATE DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION AND FINANCE; NEW YORK STATE TAX COMPLIANCE DIVISION- CHILD SUPPORT; NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING PRESERVATION & DEVELOPMENT; WORKERS' COMPENSATION BOARD OF NEW YORK STATE; COMMISSIONER OF LABOR OF THE STATE OF NEW YORK; NEW YORK CITY ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; NEW YORK CITY PARKING VIOLATIONS BUREAU; NEW YORK CITY TRANSIT ADJUDICATION BUREAU; THE CITY OF NEW YORK; STATE OF NEW YORK- DEPARTMENT OF LAW; NEW YORK CITY CRIMINAL COURT, re:1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8..(Krapf, Jamie) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Labor of the State of New York, Jesus De Los Santos, Household Finance Realty Corporation of New York, M-913 Auto Corp., New York City Criminal Court, New York City Department of Housing Preservation & Development, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, New York State Department of Taxation And Finance, New York State Tax Compliance Division-Child Support, State of New York-Department of Law, THE CITY OF NEW YORK, Workers' Compensation Board of New York State. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31030896)Document filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8..(Krapf, Jamie) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |