Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:19-bk-34054

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Bankruptcy Jud Stacey G Jernigan
Case #: 3:25-ap-03055
Nature of Suit81 Bankruptcy - Subordination of claim or interest
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Patrick Hagaman Daugherty
3621 Cornell Avenue, Suite 830
Dallas, TX 75205
Represented By
Patrick Hagaman Daugherty
contact info
Plaintiff
Highland Capital Management, L.P.
100 Crescent Court, Suite 1850
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Zachery Z. Annable
Hayward PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Tue 05/06 12:38 PM
Summons service executed on Patrick Hagaman Daugherty 5/5/2025 (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Mon 05/05 10:38 AM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 10/6/2025 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/jerniga. Trial will be held during the week of 10/20/2025. Entered on 5/5/2025 (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Highland Capital Management, L.P.
2 2 court Summons issued Mon 05/05 10:32 AM
Summons issued on Patrick Hagaman Daugherty; Answer Due 6/4/2025; (Edmond, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/02 6:20 PM
Adversary case 25-03055 Complaint by Highland Capital Management, L.P. against Patrick Hagaman Daugherty. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 81 (Subordination of claim or interest). (Annable, Zachery)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet