California Northern District Court
Judge:Alex G Tse
Case #: 3:25-cv-03906
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 1:07 PM PDT
Defendant
Robinhood Financial, LLC
Defendant
Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Defendant
Robinhood Securities, LLC
Incorporating Services, Ltd 7801 Folsom Blvd Suite 202
Sacramento, CA 95826
Plaintiff
Sean Deeney
Represented By
Stephen R. Astley
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 4:47 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 10 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 4:47 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 9 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 4:46 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 8 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 4:45 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 7 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 4:44 PM
ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting 6 Application. (shy, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 misc Proposed Summons Wed 05/07 9:18 AM
Proposed Summons. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/07 8:13 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Wed 05/07 8:12 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201].This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Sean Deeney,4 Proposed Summons filed by Sean Deeney,3 Proposed Summons filed by Sean Deeney (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 2:16 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20646130.) filed by Sean Deeney.(Kaplan, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 2:11 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20646093.) filed by Sean Deeney.(Dion, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificates of Good Standing
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 2:06 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20646011.) filed by Sean Deeney.(Gonzalez, Rene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 1:44 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20645776.) filed by Sean Deeney. Related [+]
Related: [-] es, Andrew
Att: 1 Certificates of Good Standing
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 1:16 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-20645540.) filed by Sean Deeney.(Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificates of Good Standing
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 05/06 12:57 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/20/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Mon 05/05 1:01 PM
Proposed Summons. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Mon 05/05 1:01 PM
Proposed Summons. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 05/05 1:00 PM
Proposed Summons. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20640558.). Filed by Sean Deeney. (Astley, Stephen)
Related: [-]