Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Case #: 1:25-cv-22067
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Foley Carrier Services LLC
Plaintiff
Jan Carlos Pimentel
Represented By
Zane Charles Hedaya
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Faaris Kamal Uddin
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi
contact info
Gerald Donald Lane, Jr.
The Law Offices Of Jibrael S. Hindi, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/08 2:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jan Carlos Pimentel. Foley Carrier Services LLC waiver sent on 5/8/2025, response/answer due 7/7/2025. (Hedaya, Zane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 05/06 10:08 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS. Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/6/2025. (kcs)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Tue 05/06 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/6/2025. (kcs)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 4:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Foley Carrier Services LLC. (blc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 05/05 4:16 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (blc)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Foley Carrier Services LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18423312, filed by Jan Carlos Pimentel.(Uddin, Faaris)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)