New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Joseph A Marutollo
Case #: 1:25-cv-02481
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1201 Civil Rights (Disability)
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:09 PM EDT
Defendant
IF Boutique, LTD.
Plaintiff
Lisa Cantwell
Represented By
Rami Salim
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/06 4:49 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held on July 11, 2025 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 324 North before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. The parties must complete the attached proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order and file it on ECF no later than July 7, 2025. Plaintiff is directed to ensure that all Defendants are aware of this conference. Counsel with knowledge of the case must attend the conference; per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. The parties are directed to review this Court's Individual Practices and Rules in advance of the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo on 5/6/2025. (EG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Individual Practices and Rules
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 05/05 4:21 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to IF Boutique, LTD.. (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Mon 05/05 4:20 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT Lisa Cantwell against IF Boutique, LTD. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-19018183 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Lisa Cantwell. (Salim, Rami)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/05 4:19 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Marutollo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (CV)
Related: [-]