New York Southern District Court
Judge:Arun Subramanian
Case #: 1:25-cv-03733
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 4:09 PM EDT
Petitioner
Hasan Ahmed Taleb Al-Thuraya
Represented By
Rafael Urena
Urena & Associates PLLC
contact info
Respondent
Kristi Noem
Respondent
Kika Scott


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Case Accepted as Related Wed 05/07 4:26 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:25-cv-02582-AS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 05/07 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Arun Subramanian. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 05/07 4:28 PM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (tro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 11:40 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kristi Noem, Kika Scott. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/06 11:35 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/06 11:35 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Tue 05/06 11:36 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Arun Subramanian as possibly related to 1:25-cv-02582-AS. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/06 12:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Rafael Urena to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated December 4, 2024. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated December 4, 2024. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated December 4, 2024 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-cover-sheet-2.. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 05/05 4:07 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Hasan Ahmed Taleb Al-Thuraya..(Urena, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion,
Att: 5 Affidavit of Notice on U.S. Attorney's Office
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 05/05 3:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kristi Noem and Kika Scott, re:1 Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus,. Document filed by Hasan Ahmed Taleb Al-Thuraya..(Urena, Rafael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 3:48 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hasan Ahmed Taleb Al-Thuraya..(Urena, Rafael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Mon 05/05 3:47 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:25-cv-02582-AS. Document filed by Hasan Ahmed Taleb Al-Thuraya..(Urena, Rafael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/05 3:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Urena, Rafael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint/Petition in the Nature of Mandamus Mon 05/05 3:33 PM
PETITION IN THE NATURE OF MANDAMUS against Kristi Noem, Kika Scott (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31032519).Document filed by Hasan Ahmed Taleb Al-Thuraya..(Urena, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C