New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:25-bk-10920
Case Filed:May 05, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sysorex Government Services, Inc.
13880 Dulles Corner Lane Suite 120
Herndon, VA 20171
Represented By
Michelle McMahon
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Kyriaki Christodoulou
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Ralph E Preite
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 8:26 AM EDT
Creditor
Canon U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By
Courina Yulisa
Dorsey & Whitney LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004
Represented By
Daniel Rudewicz
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 notice Notice, Appearance Fri 05/09 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Joshua R Kornfield on behalf of Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Kornfield, Joshua)
Related: [-]
19 19 7 pgs answer Objection Fri 05/09 8:03 AM
Objection to Motion Objection Of The United States Trustee To The Debtors Amended Motion For Entry Of Orders (I) (A) Approving Bidding Procedures For The Sale Of The Debtors Business; (B) Approving The Form Of Purchase Agreement; (C) Approving Form And Manner Of Service Of Auction Notice; And (D) Scheduling An Auction; (II) Approving Sale Of The Business Free And Clear Of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances And Other Interests, And (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+] filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. with hearing to be held on 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (JPM) (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 9
18 18 11 pgs motion Motion, Dismiss Case Fri 05/09 7:54 AM
Motion to Dismiss Case Motion of the United States Trustee, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1014(a)(2), to Dismiss or Transfer this Case filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee with hearing to be held on 5/28/2025 at 10:00 AM at Teleconference Line (CourtSolutions) (JPM). (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
17 17 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Fri 05/09 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #8 )
16 16 notice Notice, Appearance Thu 05/08 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Courina Yulisa on behalf of Canon U.S.A., Inc.. (Yulisa, Courina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
15 15 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 05/07 4:46 PM
Affidavit of Service Order signed on 5/6/2025 Granting Motion For Entry Of An Order Shortening The Notice Periods For First Day Hearing On Debtors First Day Motions And Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Kyriaki Christodoulou on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Christodoulou, Kyriaki)
Related: [-] 12
14 14 misc Affidavit of Service Wed 05/07 4:29 PM
Affidavit of Service First Day Pleadings Related [+] Filed by Kyriaki Christodoulou on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Christodoulou, Kyriaki)
Related: [-] 5 ,1 ,9 ,10 ,11
13 13 2 pgs notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Wed 05/07 8:50 AM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors INSTRUCTIONS FOR TELEPHONIC SECTION 341 MEETING OF CREDITORS Related [+] filed by Daniel Rudewicz on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2025 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Rudewicz, Daniel)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
12 12 order Motion, Shorten Time Tue 05/06 8:11 PM
Order signed on 5/6/2025 Granting Motion For Entry Of An Order Shortening The Notice Periods For First Day Hearing On Debtors First Day Motions And Granting Related Relief. Related [+]. With Hearing to be held on 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM) (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 2 pgs notice Notice, Hearing Tue 05/06 2:35 PM
Notice of Hearing on Debtor's First Day Motions Related [+] filed by Kyriaki Christodoulou on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM) (Christodoulou, Kyriaki)
Related: [-] 5 ,9 ,10
10 10 5 pgs motion Motion, Shorten Time Tue 05/06 2:33 PM
Motion to Shorten Time /Motion For Entry Of An Order Shortening The Notice Periods For First Day Hearing On Debtors First Day Motions, And Granting Related Relief Related [+] filed by Kyriaki Christodoulou on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc. with hearing to be held on 5/9/2025 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM). (Christodoulou, Kyriaki)
Related: [-] 5 ,9
Att: 1 Exhibit A Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B List of First Day Motions
9 9 77 pgs motion Motion, Sell Property Free And Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (Fee) Tue 05/06 1:29 PM
Amended Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) /Debtor's Amended Motion For Entry of Orders (I) (A) Approving Bidding Procedures for the Sale of the Debtor's Business; (B) Approving the Form of Purchase Agreement; (C) Approving the Form and Manner of Service of Auction Notice; and (D) Scheduling An Auction; (II) Approving the Sale of the Business Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other Interests, and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Kyriaki Christodoulou on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Christodoulou, Kyriaki)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of A. Zaman Khan In Support of Bidding Procedures and Sale Motion
8 8 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11) (BNC) Tue 05/06 9:59 AM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors - 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2025 at 02:30 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Suarez, Aurea)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Tue 05/06 1:32 PM
Receipt of Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)([LINK 25-10920 jpm] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17063307. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #9
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 misc Affidavit Mon 05/05 5:55 PM
Affidavit /Notice of Exhibit 2, Budget, to Debtor's Cash Collateral Motion Related [+] Filed by Kyriaki Christodoulou on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Christodoulou, Kyriaki)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 77 pgs motion Motion, Sell Property Free And Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) (Fee) Mon 05/05 5:03 PM
Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f) Debtors Motion For Entry Of Orders (I) (A) Approving Bidding Procedures For The Sale Of The Debtors Business; (B) Approving The Form Of Purchase Agreement; (C) Approving The Form And Manner Of Service Of Auction Notice; And (D) Scheduling An Auction; (Ii) Approving Sale Of The Business Free And Clear Of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances And Other Interests, And (Iii) Granting Related Relief filed by Michelle McMahon on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (McMahon, Michelle)
Related: [-]
5 5 14 pgs motion Motion, Approve Use of Cash Collateral Mon 05/05 4:20 PM
Motion to Approve Use of Cash Collateral filed by Kyriaki Christodoulou on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Christodoulou, Kyriaki)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Interim Order
4 4 3 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors - Official Forms 104/204 Mon 05/05 4:17 PM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders (Official Form 204) Filed by Ralph E Preite on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Preite, Ralph)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 05/05 4:16 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by Ralph E Preite on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Preite, Ralph)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Schedules Mon 05/05 4:15 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, List of Equity Security Holders, Addendum to Form 207 #30, Addendum to Schedule D - Entry 2.1 Filed by Ralph E Preite on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Preite, Ralph)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 05/05 4:02 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Chapter 11 Plan due by 9/2/2025, Disclosure Statement due by 9/2/2025, Initial Case Conference due by 6/4/2025, Filed by Ralph E Preite of Cullen and Dykman LLP on behalf of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.. (Preite, Ralph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Resolutions
Att: 2 23 pgs First Day Declaration of A. Zaman Khan, President of Sysorex Government Services, Inc.
Att: 3 Creditor Matrix
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 05/05 4:06 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-10920 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17062153. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Mon 05/05 4:10 PM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 05/05 5:05 PM
Receipt of Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens Under Section 363(f)([LINK 25-10920 jpm] ) [motion,msell] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A17062318. Fee amount 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #6