New York Northern District Court
Judge:Anne M Nardacci
Referred: Daniel J Stewart
Case #: 1:25-cv-00559
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Case in other court:Saratoga County Supreme Court, EF20251057
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:10 PM EDT
Defendant
BMO Bank, N.A.
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Leah N. Jacob
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Ryan Sirianni
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Bennington Mattress LLC
Represented By
James B. Tuttle
James B. Tuttle, Esq.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
8 8 order Order on Letter Request Mon 05/12 6:55 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Letter Request of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to extend Answer deadline to 6/11/2025. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/12/2025. (spl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
7 7 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 05/09 7:17 AM
Consent Letter Motion from Ryan Sirianni for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Sirianni, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 order Order Reassigning Case Tue 05/06 9:04 AM
TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/6/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 6:54 AM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Sirianni, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Mon 05/05 3:43 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/2/2025 at 11:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/25/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc State Court Complaint Mon 05/05 3:38 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in Saratoga County Supreme Court. (hmr)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 05/05 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saratoga County Supreme Court, case number EF20251057 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7121843) filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A..(hmr, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Verified Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - BMO Bank, N.A.'s Consent to Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Articles of Organization,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 05/05 3:51 PM
***Answer due date updated for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 5/12/2025. (hmr)
Related: [-]
misc Text Notice of Filing Deficiency Mon 05/05 3:54 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Bennington Mattress LLC regarding the2 State Court Complaint. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney addresscontained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. ****ATTORNEY TUTTLE - SUITE NUMBER ONLY NEEDS TO BE UPDATED. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 5/8/2025 (hmr)
Related: [-]