Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Roderick C Young
Case #: 3:25-cv-00341
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Henrico County, Virginia, CL-25001524-00
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:15 PM EDT
Defendant
EXTREMITY CARE, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Raymond Reyes
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Defendant
TIGER AESTHETICS MEDICAL, LLC
Represented By
Benjamin Raymond Reyes
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL DAMON


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
8 8 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 05/12 4:54 PM
Memorandum in Support re7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Extremity Care, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Benjamin
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 05/12 1:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Extremity Care, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Benjamin
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/12 1:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Tiger Aesthetics Medical, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Benjamin
misc Notice of Correction Mon 05/12 4:34 PM
Notice of Correction re7 - Incorrect filing. The Memorandum in Support should be filed as its own docket event, not included with motion. The document needs to be refiled using the proper docket event "Memorandum in Support". (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 3:01 PM
ORDER - This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative for review of the jurisdictional allegations in Defendants' Notice of Removal (ECF No.1 ). The Court ORDERS Defendants to FILE supplemental jurisdictional allegations by May 14, 2024. The Court will reconsider whether removal is proper after such filing. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 05/07/2025. (Kski, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 10:11 AM
LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7(E) STANDING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 7/16/2024. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 10:09 AM
STANDING ORDER re: electronic devices. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/15/2025. (jenjones, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 05/06 10:17 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young. (jsmi, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 4:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXTREMITY CARE, LLC, TIGER AESTHETICS MEDICAL, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Benjamin
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 05/05 4:47 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-10161362.), filed by EXTREMITY CARE, LLC, TIGER AESTHETICS MEDICAL, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] yes, Benjamin
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Affidavit