Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Daniel P Jordan, III
Referred: Andrew S Harris
Case #: 3:25-cv-00318
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:May 05, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
2 2 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 11:59 AM
ORDERED: That Petitioner Harriss, on or before May 23, 2025, must file a response and provide the following information: (a) state the criminal charge(s) that is/are the reason for this habeas petition; (b) state if Petitioner Richard Lee Harriss is the same individual as defendant Richard Harris in United States v. Harris, No. 3:24-cr-00106-CWR-ASH; (c) state if Harriss is represented by an attorney or public defender; and (d) state if Harriss has received a trial date for the criminal charge(s), and if a trial date has been set, state the date. That the Clerk is directed to email a copy of this Order to Defendant Harriss's counsel in Case No. 3:24-cr-106-CWR-ASH for informational purposes only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris on 05/07/2025. (CDS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 05/05 4:10 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5 receipt number 11572), filed by Richard Lee Harriss.(CDS) (CDS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Att: 2 (5/5/2025) Notice of Assignment NOA