Missouri Western District Court
Judge:M Douglas Harpool
Case #: 6:25-cv-03107
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:10 PM CDT
Defendant
Sheriff Chris Degase
Defendant
Douglas County
Plaintiff
Aaron Edward Meier
PO Box 1451
Ava, MO 65608


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Fri 05/09 9:27 AM
NOTICE of filing additional Civil Cover Sheet by Aaron Edward Meier re1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (KSS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/08 10:08 AM
NOTICE of filing Return Address by Aaron Edward Meier. (Plaintiff's address added to docket) (Siegert, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 order Order Transferring/Reassigning Case Tue 05/06 10:22 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Douglas Harpool, this case is hereby TRANSFERRED to Judge Harpool for all further proceedings as it is related to an earlier numbered case assigned to Judge Harpool. District Judge Stephen R. Bough no longer assigned to case. Signed on 5/6/2025 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Peters, Tracey)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 3:06 PM
Pro Se MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, related case: 6:24-cv-03099-MDH, filed by Aaron Edward Meier. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/19/2025 unless otherwise directed by the court. NEF mailed to Plaintiff.(Furtak, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit Attachment,
Att: 3 Motion to Remove to Federal Court,
Att: 4 Petition for 2241,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Cover Page