v. Patriot Mobile LLC
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Referred: | Brian Mckay |
Case #: | 3:25-mc-00028 |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Thu 05/08 12:06 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Any response to the Motion to Compel Subpoena Compliance filed by Plintron Technologies USA, LLC [Dkt. No 1] is due Tuesday, May 27, 2025. Any reply is due 14 days after a response is filed. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 5/8/2025) |
|
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: The court refers this case United States Magistrate Judge Brian McKay for pretrial management. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(b). To that end, the court prospectively refers to the magistrate judge: (1) all non-dispositive motions for determination; (2) all case dispositive motions for recommendation; and (3) all other pretrial matters including scheduling and alternative dispute resolution for appropriate action consistent with applicable law. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 5/6/2025) (cea) |
|
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Appendix in Support filed by Plintron Technologies USA, LLC re1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance (Hanna, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() MOTION to Compel Subpoena Compliance filed by Plintron Technologies USA, LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Justin David Hanna added to party Plintron Technologies USA, LLC(pty:mov) (Hanna, Justin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
qcref
Fish
Tue 05/06 4:36 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case preliminarily assigned to Judge McKay for items that may be referred. (cfk) |