New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:25-bk-42173
Case Filed:May 05, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Chloe's NYC, LLC
9413 Avenue L
Brooklyn, NY 11236-4808
Represented By
Ronald D Weiss
Ronald D. Weiss, Esq.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/06 2:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Enid Nagler Stuart on behalf of NYS Department of Taxation & Finance (Stuart, Enid)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Tue 05/06 1:19 PM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by Office of the United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/9/2025 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 953-2748, Participant Code 3415538, Enter # sign. (Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Tue 05/06 3:46 PM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11Voluntary Petition [Pages 1-8] (Question 7c unanswered) due by 5/5/2025. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 5/5/2025.Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 5/5/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 5/5/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 5/5/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/19/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/19/2025. Schedule D due 5/19/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/19/2025. Schedule G due 5/19/2025. Schedule H due 5/19/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/19/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/19/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/19/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/19/2025. (caf)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 05/05 12:56 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Ronald D Weiss on behalf of Chloe's NYC, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/2/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 09/2/2025. (Weiss, Ronald)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Mon 05/05 12:58 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1 25-42173 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23583191. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1