California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:25-cv-03921
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 05, 2025 5:48 PM PDT
Defendant
Capital One Bank, N.A.
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
Defendant
Radius Global Solutions, LLC
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
Plaintiff
Steven Matthew Hernandez
Represented By
Lauren Brooks Sabb Veggian
The Cardoza Law Corporation
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 05/06 2:38 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2025, 11:00 AM in San Francisco - via Zoom. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 2:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Radius Global Solutions, LLC, Trans Union LLC. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 05/06 8:09 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/19/2025. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 05/05 5:05 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Steven Matthew Hernandez (Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 05/05 5:03 PM
Proposed Summons. (Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 4:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Radius Global Solutions, LLC, Trans Union LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20642375.). Filed by Steven Matthew Hernandez.(Veggian, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet