New Rite Aid, LLC
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael B Kaplan |
Case #: | 3:25-bk-14861 |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2025 |
Debtor
New Rite Aid, LLC
200 Newberry Cmns
Etters, PA 17319-9363 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago |
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
34 | 34
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Thomas S. Onder on behalf of Levin Management Corporation. (Onder, Thomas) |
|
33 | 33
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Alan J. Brody on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA. (Brody, Alan) |
|
32 | 32
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Alan J. Brody on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA. (Brody, Alan) |
|
31 | 31
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey Kurtzman on behalf of AMS Olyphant RA, LLC, Goodman Properties, Kingsway Realty Company, The Goldenberg Group. (Kurtzman, Jeffrey) |
|
30 | 30
![]() ORDER REGARDING DEBTORS APPLICATION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION OF FIRST DAY MATTERS Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/6/2025. Hearing scheduled for 5/7/2025 at 02:00 PM, MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton.. (bwj) |
|
29 | 29
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Lauren Bielskie on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Bielskie, Lauren) |
|
28 | 28
![]() EMERGENCY INTERIM ORDER AUTHORIZING BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. TO HONOR CHECKS AND PAYMENTS ISSUED FROM THE PAYROLL ACCOUNT . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/6/2025. (bwj) |
|
27 | 27
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Sponder, Jeffrey) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
25 | 25
![]() Motion re: / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Assume and Perform Under the Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing and Approving the Sale of Closing Location Assets, with Such Sales to be Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, and Encumbrances, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
24 | 24
![]() Document re: / Declaration of Marc Liebman, Chief Transformation Officer of the Debtors, in Support of Debtors' Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Motions filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
23 | 23
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Management System, (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, (C) Maintain Existing Business Forms, and (D) Perform Intercompany Transactions and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
22 | 22
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Establishing Procedures for the Sale of Certain Leases and Fee Owned Properties, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
21 | 21
![]() Motion re: / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing (A) Rejection of Certain Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (B) Abandonment of any Personal Property, each Effective as of the Petition Date and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Declaration of Adam Rifkin in Support of the Debtors' Bidding Procedures Motion in support of filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
19 | 19
![]() Declaration of Elise S. Frejka in Support of Debtors' Motion for Entry of Orders (I) Approving Bidding Procedures and Related Relief and (II) Authorizing and Approving the Conduct of Closing Location Sales, with Such Sales to be Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, and Encumbrances and Related Relief in support of filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain a Claims and Noticing Agent Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Auction and Bidding Procedures, (II) Scheduling Certain Dates and Deadlines with Respect Thereto, (III) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof, (IV) Establishing Notice Procedures for the Assumption and Assignment of Contracts and Leases, (V) Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of Assumed Contracts, (VI) Authorizing (A) the Sale of Assets and (B) Shortened Notice with Respect Thereto, and (VII) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
15 | 15
![]() Motion re: / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Procedures to Reject, Assume, or Assume and Assign Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Associate Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation, and Reimbursable Associate Expenses and (B) Continue Associate Benefits Programs, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Motion re: / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Maintain and Administer Their Customer Programs, as Modified, and (B) Honor Certain Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Motion re: / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Approving the Debtors' Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utilities Services, (II) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services, (III) Approving the Debtors' Proposed Procedures for Resolving Adequate Assurance Requests, (IV) Authorizing Certain Fee Payments for Services Performed, and (V) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Maintain Insurance and Surety Coverage Entered into Prepetition and Pay Related Prepetition Obligations, and (B) Renew, Supplement, Modify, or Purchase Insurance and Surety Coverage, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Motion re: / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Approving Notification and Hearing Procedures for Certain Transfers of, and Declarations of Worthlessness with Respect to, Common Stock, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Motion re: / Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Establishing a Record Date for Notice and Sell-Down Procedures for Trading in Certain Claims Against the Debtors' Estates, (II) Establishing Procedures for Notification and Trading in Certain Claims Against the Debtors' Estates, and (Iii) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Establishing Procedures for the De Minimis Asset Transactions, (II) Authorizing and Establishing Procedures for De Minimis Asset Abandonment, and (III) Approving the Form and Manner of the Notice of De Minimis Asset Transactions and Abandonment Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Motion to Extend Time to File Missing Schedules Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Motion re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Taxes and Fees and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Motion re: - Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) File a Consolidated List of the Debtors' Fifty Largest Unsecured Creditors, (B) File a Consolidated List of Creditors in Lieu of Submitting a Separate Mailing Matrix for Each Debtor, (C) Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information of Natural Persons, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Application for Designation as a Chapter 11 Complex Case Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 25-14730 MBK 25-14731 MBK 25-14743 MBK 25-14744 MBK 25-14745 MBK 25-14746 MBK 25-14747 MBK 25-14748 MBK 25-14749 MBK 25-14750 MBK 25-14751 MBK 25-14752 MBK 25-14753 MBK 25-14754 MBK 25-14755 MBK 25-14756 MBK 25-14757 MBK 25-14759 MBK 25-14760 MBK 25-14761 MBK 25-14762 MBK 25-14763 MBK 25-14764 MBK 25-14765 MBK 25-14766 MBK 25-14767 MBK 25-14768 MBK 25-14769 MBK 25-14770 MBK 25-14771 MBK 25-14772 MBK 25-14773 MBK 25-14774 MBK 25-14775 MBK 25-14776 MBK 25-14777 MBK 25-14778 MBK 25-14779 MBK 25-14780 MBK 25-14781 MBK 25-14782 MBK 25-14784 MBK 25-14785 MBK 25-14786 MBK 25-14787 MBK 25-14788 MBK 25-14789 MBK 25-14790 MBK 25-14791 MBK 25-14792 MBK 25-14793 MBK 25-14794 MBK 25-14795 MBK 25-14796 MBK 25-14797 MBK 25-14798 MBK 25-14799 MBK 25-14800 MBK 25-14801 MBK 25-14802 MBK 25-14803 MBK 25-14804 MBK 25-14805 MBK 25-14806 MBK 25-14807 MBK 25-14808 MBK 25-14809 MBK 25-14810 MBK 25-14811 MBK 25-14812 MBK 25-14813 MBK 25-14814 MBK 25-14815 MBK 25-14816 MBK 25-14817 MBK 25-14818 MBK 25-14819 MBK 25-14820 MBK 25-14821 MBK 25-14822 MBK 25-14823 MBK 25-14824 MBK 25-14825 MBK 25-14826 MBK 25-14827 MBK 25-14828 MBK 25-14829 MBK 25-14830 MBK 25-14831 MBK 25-14832 MBK 25-14833 MBK 25-14834 MBK 25-14835 MBK 25-14836 MBK 25-14837 MBK 25-14838 MBK 25-14839 MBK 25-14840 MBK 25-14841 MBK 25-14842 MBK 25-14843 MBK 25-14844 MBK 25-14845 MBK 25-14846 MBK 25-14847 MBK 25-14848 MBK 25-14849 MBK 25-14850 MBK 25-14851 MBK 25-14852 MBK 25-14853 MBK 25-14854 MBK 25-14855 MBK 25-14856 MBK 25-14857 MBK 25-14859 MBK 25-14860 MBK 25-14861 MBK.. (Sirota, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 05/05 10:49 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Michael B. Kaplan added to the case. (nrf) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of New Rite Aid, LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 09/2/2025. (Sirota, Michael) |