New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cv-03605
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 12:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Carlos Moran
Defendant
Yonkers City School District
Plaintiff
Melissa Anderson
448 Terrace Avenue Apt. 3B
Bergen, NJ 07604


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Mon 05/05 10:11 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 03/18/2024) (sac)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Mon 05/05 10:10 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information. (sac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
3 3 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Mon 05/05 10:10 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Melissa Anderson consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Melissa Anderson. (sac)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 10:08 AM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Melissa Anderson. (sac)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT against Carlos Moran, Yonkers City School District. Document filed by Melissa Anderson. (sac)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 05/05 10:08 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sac)
Related: [-]