New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Sanket J Bulsara
Referred: James M Wicks
Case #: 2:25-cv-02471
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause15:1126 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 04, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Ross Kanarek
Plaintiff
Chengdu ShiQiaoShang Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Wei Wang
Glacier Law LLP
contact info
Tao Liu
Glacier Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Shenzhen Yulonglong Technology Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Wei Wang
Glacier Law LLP
contact info
Tao Liu
Glacier Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Wed 05/07 12:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay no longer assigned to case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/6/2025. (LF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 1:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Ross Kanarek. (LJ)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120 Mon 05/05 1:36 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Notification,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Notification,
Att: 4 Exhibit C U.S. Patent No. 10,197,630,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Prior Art,
Att: 6 Exhibit E Prior Art,
Att: 7 Exhibit F Prior Art,
Att: 8 Exhibit G Prior Art,
Att: 9 Exhibit H Prior Art
8 8 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 05/05 1:31 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 05/05 12:11 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV) (LJ).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (5/5/2025) Additional Corrections
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/05 10:49 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint,, by Chengdu ShiQiaoShang Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Yulonglong Technology Co., Ltd. (Wang, Wei)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/05 10:10 AM
Notice: Requires Newly Updated Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil cover sheet has been updated and The Clerk's Office requires the updated version of the civil cover sheet to continue to process this case. The form is available at:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/forms/js-44-civil-cover-sheet] Please resubmit using new JS44 under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (CV)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/05 1:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sanket J. Bulsara and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tao Liu on behalf of Chengdu ShiQiaoShang Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Yulonglong Technology Co., Ltd. (aty to be noticed) (Liu, Tao)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Wei Wang on behalf of Chengdu ShiQiaoShang Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Yulonglong Technology Co., Ltd. (notification declined or already on case) (Wang, Wei)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Chengdu ShiQiaoShang Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Yulonglong Technology Co., Ltd. (Wang, Wei)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint,, by Chengdu ShiQiaoShang Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Yulonglong Technology Co., Ltd. (Wang, Wei)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs COMPLAINT against Ross Kanarek filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-19014674 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Chengdu ShiQiaoShang Technology Co., Ltd., Shenzhen Yulonglong Technology Co., Ltd.. (Wang, Wei)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notification,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Notification,
Att: 3 Exhibit C U.S. Patent No. 10,197,630,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Prior Art,
Att: 5 Exhibit E Prior Art,
Att: 6 Exhibit F Prior Art,
Att: 7 Exhibit G Prior Art,
Att: 8 Exhibit H Prior Art