Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Shalina D Kumar
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-11288
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 11:04 PM EDT
Defendant
Hakim Berry
Defendant
David Miller
Defendant
Regents of the University of Michigan
Defendant
The University of Michigan Medical School
Defendant
The University of Michigan, Michigan Medicine
Defendant
Jovita Thomas-Williams
Plaintiff
Christine Oldenburg-McGee
Represented By
Sarah Prescott
Salvatore Prescott, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 order Stipulation and Order Fri 05/09 1:48 PM
STIPULATED ORDER. Defendants' Answer to complaint due by 6/20/2025. Signed by District Judge Shalina D. Kumar. (THal)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/09 1:13 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 notice Appearance Thu 05/08 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frances J. Hollander on behalf of All Defendants. (Hollander, Frances)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Thu 05/08 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M. Schwartz on behalf of All Defendants. (Schwartz, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued* Mon 05/05 1:21 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Hakim Berry, David Miller, Regents of the University of Michigan, The University of Michigan Medical School, The University of Michigan, Michigan Medicine, Jovita Thomas-Williams* (MSyl)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Correction Mon 05/05 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Correction re2 Summons Issued. (MSyl)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 05/05 12:10 PM
[STRICKEN] SUMMONS Issued for *Hakim Berry, David Miller, Regents of the University of Michigan, The University of Michigan Medical School, The University of Michigan, Michigan Medicine, Jovita Thomas-Williams* (MSyl) Modified on 5/5/2025 (MSyl).
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 05/05 1:22 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (MSyl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christine Oldenburg-McGee against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10223043 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Washtenaw - County of 1st Defendant: Washtenaw. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): State of Michigan, Washtenaw County Circuit Court, 25-000555-CB, Judge Judge Carol Kuhnke ] (Prescott, Sarah)
Related: [-]