Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:25-cv-00546
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Avanos Medical, Inc.
Defendant
Diros Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff
Stratus Medical, LLC
Represented By
Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Christine Dealy Haynes
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 10:53 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (mws)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 9:04 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 8:48 AM
Summons Issued as to Avanos Medical, Inc. on 5/5/2025; Diros Technology, Inc. on 5/5/2025.(cdd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 05/05 8:44 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Neurovasis, Inc. for Stratus Medical, LLC filed by Stratus Medical, LLC. (cdd)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Mon 05/05 8:42 AM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 10,925,664; 10,966,782; 10,736,688. (cdd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Mon 05/05 8:41 AM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cdd)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 8:40 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with Jury Demand against Avanos Medical, Inc., Diros Technology, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4677549) - filed by Stratus Medical, LLC.(cdd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet