Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:25-cv-02470
Nature of Suit443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:12 AM EDT
Defendant
Judge Alex Ricciardulli
Defendant
Los Angeles Homeless Services Authority (LAHSA)
Defendant
Los Angeles Housing Department (LAHD)
Defendant
Los Angeles Police Department Topanga Canyon Police Division
Defendant
Mashcole Property Management
Defendant
Mass and Company
Defendant
Judge Douglas C. McCormick
Defendant
Montera Ridge Apartments
Defendant
Neighborhood Legal Services of Los Angeles County
Defendant
Govenor Gavin Newsom
Defendant
Sharen L. Ransom
Defendant
Los Angeles County Sheriff's Department, Civil Management Bureau
Defendant
Nancy Sandoval
Defendant
Stanley Mosk Courthouse, Appellate Division Clerks
Defendant
UCLA Olive View-UCLA Medical Center
Defendant
UCLA Ronald Regan Medical Center
Defendant
UCLA West Valley Medical Center
Defendant
Unites States District Court Clerks, Central District of California
Defendant
Van Nuys Courthouse East Clerks
Defendant
West Hills Hospital
Defendant
Judge Michael B. Wilson
Defendant
Judge Kimberly Guilemet
Defendant
21845 Saticoy Leasing Office
Defendant
21845 Saticoy St. LLC
Defendant
Judge Michael R. Amerian
Defendant
Mayor Karen Bass
Defendant
Judge Stanley Bloomfield, Jr.
Defendant
Councilman Bob Blumenfield
Defendant
Department of Health Services, County of Los Angeles
Defendant
Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD)
Defendant
Detective Thorton
Defendant
Dignity Health Medical Center
Defendant
Legal Aid Foundation of Los Angeles
Defendant
Hope of the Valley
Defendant
Housing Authority of the City of Los Angeles (HACLA)
Defendant
Housing Rights Center
Defendant
Housing for Health
Defendant
Deputy Christopher Jordan
Defendant
Judge Matthew Kanin
Defendant
Judge Sanjay Kumar
Defendant
LA Family Housing
Defendant
Dr. John Landsberger
Plaintiff
Dorlisa Thomas
21845 Saticoy St. Apt. 214
Canoga Park, CA 91304


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
10 10 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 05/07 3:40 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action without prejudice (ajw)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Vacate Order on Motion for Order Wed 05/07 3:33 PM
ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Complaint Doc. [1-1]; DENIES Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order Doc.3 ; DENIES Plaintiff's motion for emergency filing Privileges (as an ADA accommodation) Doc.4 ; and DENIES Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel Doc.6 . Finally, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 05/07/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/07 3:43 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dorlisa Thomas re10 Clerk's Judgment,9 Order. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/07 3:44 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (ajw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Filing Wed 05/07 9:47 AM
NOTICE of Filing Cover Sheet by Dorlisa Thomas (ajw)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 4:34 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is also DIRECTED to submit this file to the assigned District Judge for consideration of the request for a temporary restraining order and injunctive relief and for further proceedings, including a frivolity determination under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard on 05/05/2025. (ajw)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Stay Vacate For Order Mon 05/05 4:32 PM
MOTION for Legal Council and MOTION to Stay all proceedings, MOTION to Vacate Show Cause Order, MOTION for Order preventing illegal lockout scheduled for April 28, 2025by Dorlisa Thomas.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
5 5 12 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 4:24 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 4:18 PM
MOTION for Emergency ADA Accommodation-CM/ECF Electronic Filing Access by Dorlisa Thomas. (ajw)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Mon 05/05 4:15 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Dorlisa Thomas. (ajw)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dorlisa Thomas.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/05 3:24 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dorlisa Thomas.(ajw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Motion for TRO,
Att: 3 Request for ADA Accomdation,
Att: 4 Emergency ADA request for Legal Council and Stay,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 3:25 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/05 4:25 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Dorlisa Thomas as to Dorlisa Thomas re5 Order. (mlb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/05 4:37 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Dorlisa Thomas re7 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ajw)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 05/05 4:38 PM
Submission of3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order,2 Complaint for frivolity determination to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (ajw)
Related: [-]