Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:25-cv-02474
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:13 AM EDT
Defendant
John Does 1-3
Defendant
Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Wharton
The Chartwell Law Offices LLP
contact info
Robert A. Luskin
Chartwell Law
contact info
Defendant
XYZ Corporations 1-3
Plaintiff
Crystal Nu-Man
Represented By
Inna Voronkina
John Foy & Associates, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 30+ pgs order Order Tue 05/06 9:10 AM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on May 6, 2025. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 05/05 3:31 PM
Federal Amended ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.. Discovery ends on 10/2/2025.(Luskin, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Mon 05/05 3:28 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Ollie's Bargain Outlet, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-14272639)(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Summons from State Court,
Att: 3 Petition for Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet