Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gerald A Mchugh
Case #: 2:25-cv-02209
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:12 AM EDT
Defendant
DAVID MARDINLY AND MARDINLY ENTERPRISES, LLC
Defendant
GIBSON & PERKINS P.C.
Defendant
MICHAEL ALAN SIDDONS, ESQ.
Defendant
PAUL FELLMAN ESQ.
Defendant
THE LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL ALAN SIDDONS, ESQ.
Defendant
JOHN J. WHELAN
Plaintiff
DAVID HATCHIGIAN


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
5 5 motion Recusal Tue 05/13 2:52 PM
MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF DAVID HATCHIGIAN FOR JUDGE MCHUGH TO RECUSE HIMSELF, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Cover Page
Friday, May 09, 2025
misc Remark Fri 05/09 9:41 AM
Copy of Order (Doc. No. 4) along with Blank IFP Form mailed to Plaintiff on 5/9/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 order Pro Se Civil Admin Order 5 Tue 05/06 7:00 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF HAVING FILE A COMPLAINT WITH THE COURT WITHOUT EITHER PAYING THE FEES TO COMMENCE A CIVIL ACTION OR FILING A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, PLAINTIFF MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER PAY $405 TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THE CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/6/25. 5/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Fri 05/09 8:57 AM
IFP Form E-Mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff on 5/9/25. (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Mon 05/05 4:14 PM
PRO SE NOTICE RE: GUIDELINES. (va)
Related: [-]
2 2 trial Exhibit Mon 05/05 3:08 PM
EXHIBITS by DAVID HATCHIGIAN..(va)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 3:06 PM
COMPLAINT against DAVID MARDINLY AND MARDINLY ENTERPRISES, LLC, GIBSON & PERKINS P.C., MICHAEL ALAN SIDDONS, ESQ., PAUL FELLMAN ESQ., THE LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL ALAN SIDDONS, ESQ., JOHN J. WHELAN, filed by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. FEE NOT PAID. NO IFP.(va)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
misc Jury Demand Mon 05/05 3:09 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DAVID HATCHIGIAN. (va)
Related: [-]