Puerto Rico District Court
Judge:Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan
Case #: 3:25-cv-01250
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:10 AM AST
Petitioner
Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By
Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Castaner Law Offices P.S.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM AST
Friday, May 09, 2025
5 5 order Memorandum of the Clerk Fri 05/09 1:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Francisco A. Besosa (Docket No. 3), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan, who presides over related case 25-cv-1146-MAJ, and has consented to the transfer (Docket No. 4). Signed by Clerk on 05/09/2025. (gr)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Order Fri 05/09 1:32 PM
ORDER: In light of the Order entered by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa at docket entry no. 3 , the undersigned hereby consents to the transfer of this proceeding. Signed by Judge Maria Antongiorgi-Jordan on 5/9/2025. (mr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 order Order Tue 05/06 3:12 PM
ORDER re1 Complaint. This case is transferred to the docket of Judge Maria Antongiorgi, who presides over related case number 25-1146 (MAJ), subject to her consent. Signed by Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/06/2025. (brc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 05/06 8:25 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Senior Judge Francisco A. Besosa. (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 7:14 PM
COMPLAINT -PETITION FOR EXONERATION FROM OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY against Commonwealth of Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $405 receipt number APRDC-9087326.), filed by Commonwealth of Puerto Rico. Service due by 8/4/2025,(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Sheet