Julie Reilly v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-02672 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Julie Reilly
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 05/05 4:40 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(Associated as of 3/28/2025), Julie Reilly v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02672-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Middle District of Florida (moor) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (moor) |
|
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12357270.), filed by Julie Reilly. Service due by 6/26/2025(moor) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12357235.), filed by Christina Anderson. Service due by 6/26/2025(moor) |