Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Reed C O'Connor
Case #: 4:25-cv-00490
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
misc Order Receipt Tue 05/06 9:16 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Tue May 6 09:16:08 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Tue 05/06 9:12 AM
ORDER AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES IN A MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 2255: The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Stephen S Gilstrap-DOJ for USA added. Deadline to reply to the answer is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 5/5/2025) (hcc)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 05/05 1:03 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Mon May 5 13:03:54 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 misc Affidavit Mon 05/05 3:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT In Support re3 Supplemental Document by Ethel Oyekunle-Bubu. (tle)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Supplemental Document Mon 05/05 3:29 PM
Supplemental Document by Ethel Oyekunle-Bubu as to1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (tle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Mon 05/05 1:02 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wxc)
Related: [-]
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 Mon 05/05 12:23 PM
MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 4:20-cr-00290-O-8) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
Related: [-]
qcref O' Connor (FORT WORTH CASES) Mon 05/05 1:00 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: Appropriate Staff Attorney. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc)
Related: [-]