Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 2:25-cv-01512
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 12:41 AM MST
Defendant
Lance R Broberg
Defendant
Tiffany Broberg
Defendant
Tiffany & Bosco PA
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Stacy Cole
Represented By
Kenneth Wayne Schutt
Schutt Law Firm PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/05 4:08 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 31, 2025. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/5/2025. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/05 4:06 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defectthat would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order onDefendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/5/2025. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 05/05 2:52 PM
Summons Issued as to Lance R Broberg, Tiffany Broberg, Tiffany & Bosco PA.(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 misc New Case Opened Mon 05/05 2:48 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24254691. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-01512 PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Mon 05/05 2:47 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Stacy Cole. (submitted by Kenneth Schutt)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/05 2:46 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24254691 filed by Stacy Cole. (submitted by Kenneth Schutt)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet