California Central District Court
Judge:Stephen V Wilson
Referred: Alicia G Rosenberg
Case #: 2:25-cv-03965
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 order Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition Wed 05/07 1:45 PM
ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (FEDERAL CUSTODY) by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Respondent James Engleman file Answer to the Petition not later than 7/21/2025. Motions to Dismiss shall be filed by 7/7/2025. Within 14 days, Respondent shall serve and file a Notice of Appearance notifying the court of the name of the attorney who will have principal charge of the case, together with the address where the attorney may be served, and the attorney's telephone and fax number. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (See Order for Further Details). (kl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Petition
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Mon 05/05 9:24 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
3 3 notice Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111) Mon 05/05 9:23 PM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),1 (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 8 pgs misc Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Mon 05/05 9:20 PM
MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Petitioner Rafael Orlando Ramirez-Barillas. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),1 (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Mon 05/05 9:18 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 5 DUE), filed by Petitioner Rafael Orlando Ramirez-Barillas. (car)
Related: [-]