California Central District Court
Judge:Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:25-cv-00946
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Case in other court:County of Orange Superior Court, 30-02025-01467521-CU-BC-CJC
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Resnick and Louis, P.C.
Defendant
Stat Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Tod Michael Castronovo
Shaver Castronovo LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Martha Ramirez
Represented By
James R Traut
Traut Frim
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 misc Notice of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent CV-20B optional html form Mon 05/05 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Mon 05/05 2:49 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to clerical error. Case is transferred to the Southern Division. Case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. New Case Number 8:25-cv-946 DFM. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
4 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, (Castronovo, Tod)
Related: [-]
3 3 Notice filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. OF INTRESTED PARTIES (Castronovo, Tod)
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Castronovo, Tod)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2025 01467521 Receipt No: ACACDC-39633215 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attorney Tod Michael Castronovo added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Castronovo, Tod)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Copy of the Summons and Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 05/05 2:57 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 10, Resnick and Louis, P.C., Stat Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company., filed by plaintiff Martha Ramirez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/14/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]