California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:25-cv-03895
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 04, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 8:08 PM PDT
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.180.142.116
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Law Offices Of Lincoln Bandlow, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 05/05 1:17 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (kam2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 05/05 10:10 AM
Case assigned to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
4 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register).(Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 67.180.142.116 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20638031.). Filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet