California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:25-cv-03718
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2025
Case in other court:San Mateo Superior Court, 24-CIV-08300
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 8:05 PM PDT
Defendant
Federal Express Corporation
Represented By
Jane Margaret Flynn
Federal Express Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Shannon Wells
512-7th Street #15
Rocky Top, TN 37769


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 05/05 12:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2025 02:00 PM via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ndr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
10 10 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/05 11:06 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment Mon 05/05 10:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) copy placed in O:drive for mailing on 5/5/2025
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 10:26 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Express Corporation.. (Flynn, Jane)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
7 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 7/23/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/30/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
6 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2025. (as, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal Express Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fedex Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. re1 Notice of Removal, (Flynn, Jane)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE by Federal Express Corporation re1 Notice of Removal, (Flynn, Jane)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Federal Express Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fedex Corporation for Federal Express Corporation. re1 Notice of Removal, (Flynn, Jane)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Federal Express Corporation . (Flynn, Jane)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Mateo Superior Court. Their case number is 24-CIV-08300. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20620012). Filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Flynn, Jane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Declaration Jane Flynn,
Att: 4 Declaration Gabriel Hernandez,
Att: 5 Declaration Shahram Eslami