California Northern District Court
Judge:Eumi K Lee
Referred: Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-03872
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 03, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 8:06 PM PDT
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.223.210.180
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Law Offices Of Lincoln Bandlow, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 05/07 4:25 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/13/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Eumi K. Lee. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom meeting. Case Management Statement remains due by 7/30/2025. Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who will be present at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at eklcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 8/11/2025 at 5:00 PM PT. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/07 10:05 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2025 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 05/07 10:00 AM
Remark emailed AO 121 to copyright office (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 05/05 10:26 AM
Case assigned to Judge Eumi K Lee and Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
4 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register).(Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 107.223.210.180 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20637691.). Filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Bandlow, Lincoln)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet