Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:25-cv-05382
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 12:44 AM PDT
Defendant
The Hartford Insurance Group Inc
Represented By
Ryan J. Hesselgesser
Forsberg & Umlauf (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
David Whisnant
Represented By
Burke L Huber
Van Law Firm (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 order TMC - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Wed 05/07 4:05 PM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/22/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/29/2025, Joint Status Report due by 8/5/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Wed 05/07 11:10 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Mason County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MDH)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Wed 05/07 11:00 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), The Hartford Insurance Group Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 5/14/2025. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MDH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 05/07 11:05 AM
District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright added. (MDH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Mon 05/05 9:28 PM
DECLARATION of Ryan J. Hesselgesser re1 Notice of Removal by Defendant The Hartford Insurance Group Inc(Hesselgesser, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit OIC Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit OIC printout,
Att: 4 Exhibit Wolters Kluwer, Service of Process,
Att: 5 Exhibit Excerpts of Policy,
Att: 6 Exhibit Demand for Policy Limits
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 05/05 9:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mason County Superior Court, case number 25 2-00150 23; Related [+] filed by The Hartford Insurance Group Inc.(Hesselgesser, Ryan)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8961183
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet