Georgia Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 1:25-bk-55076
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
McKnights Academy of Excellence LLC
5078 Lower Elm St
Atlanta, GA 30349-1676
Represented By
Brad Fallon
Fallon Law PC
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 28 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Turnover Thu 05/15 12:57 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Turnover Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
14 14 order Turnover, Motion for Mon 05/12 8:58 AM
Order Granting In Part Debtor's Emergency Motion for Turnover. Related [+] Service by BNC. Entered on 5/12/2025. (mrw)
Related: [-] 7
Friday, May 09, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Sat 05/10 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fees Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual Sat 05/10 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors Sat 05/10 12:53 AM
Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc 0-Certificate of Service Fri 05/09 12:34 PM
Certificate of Service of Order and Notice of Emergency Hearing and Emergency Motions for Turnover and Expedited Hearing filed by Brad Fallon on behalf of McKnights Academy of Excellence LLC. Related [+] (Fallon, Brad)
Related: [-] 7 ,8 ,9
9 9 order 01-Order Fri 05/09 11:29 AM
Order Granting Debtor's Motion For Expedited Hearing And Order And Notice Scheduling Expedited Hearing. Hearing to be held on 5/9/2025 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. [Review order for virtual hearing information.] To be served by Debtor's counsel. Entered on 5/9/2025. Related [+] (mrw)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 motion Shorten Time, Motion to Fri 05/09 4:48 AM
Emergency Motion to Shorten Time for Expedited Hearing on Debtor's Motion for Turnover of Frozen Bank Account filed by Brad Fallon on behalf of McKnights Academy of Excellence LLC. Related [+] (Fallon, Brad)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Turnover, Motion for Fri 05/09 4:39 AM
Emergency Motion for Turnover of Frozen Bank Account filed by Brad Fallon on behalf of McKnights Academy of Excellence LLC. (Fallon, Brad)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Autodocket of Credit Card Fri 05/09 11:05 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-55076 ) [caseupld,4002u] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt Number A63203958. Fee Amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual) Wed 05/07 6:41 AM
Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual). Service by BNC. Tax Return Date: 5/13/2025. Balance Sheet Date: 5/13/2025.Statement of Operations Due 5/13/2025Cash Flow Statement due 5/13/2025 (cws)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Regarding Unpaid Case Filing Fees Wed 05/07 6:38 AM
Order Regarding Unpaid Filing Fee in the Amount of $ 1,738.00 . Service by BNC. Entered on 5/7/2025. Related [+] (cws)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 misc 03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11) Wed 05/07 6:35 AM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case and Meeting of Creditors. 341 Meeting to be held on 6/6/2025 at 01:00 PM via Telephone conference. To attend, Dial 888-902-9750 and enter participation code 9635734. (11 Atl) Non-Government Proof of Claims due by 7/15/2025. Status Conference to be held on 6/24/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 1401, Atlanta. (cws)
Related: [-]
misc Deadline for Filing Pre-Status Conference Report Wed 05/07 6:35 AM
Deadline: Pre-Status Conference Report Due By 6/10/2025. (cws)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 1 pgs trustee Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Tue 05/06 4:41 PM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee Todd E. Hennings filed by Trustee. (Hinderleider, Alan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Verified Statement
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 8:52 AM
Notice of Appearance Filed by Alan Hinderleider on behalf of Office of the United States Trustee. (Hinderleider, Alan)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs caseupld Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 05/06 3:43 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)for Non-Individual Subchapter V filed by Brad Fallon of Fallon Law PC on behalf of McKnights Academy of Excellence LLC. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Plan Due by 08/4/2025. (Fallon, Brad)
Related: [-]