New York Southern District Court
Judge:P Kevin Castel
Case #: 1:25-cv-03745
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:12 AM EDT
Defendant
ADVANTAGE COLLEGE PLANNING FRANCHISING, INC.
Defendant
ADVANTAGE COLLEGE PLANNING, LLC
Defendant
BROOKE DALY
Defendant
TRAVIS DALY
Plaintiff
EPISODE 3, LLC d/b/a STRIVEPATH


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 2:24 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Melissa DeCandia on behalf of Episode 3, LLC..(DeCandia, Melissa)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gavin Michael Strube on behalf of Episode 3, LLC..(Strube, Gavin)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Wed 05/07 1:09 PM
ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) SHALL IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO ALL PARTIES. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/15/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/7/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 2:41 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advantage College Planning, LLC..(gp)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc AO 120 Form Trademark - Case Opening - Submitted Tue 05/06 2:40 PM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)..(gp)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 2:39 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Advantage College Planning Franchising, Inc...(gp)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brooke Daly..(gp)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 2:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travis Daly..(gp)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/06 12:00 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travis Daly, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by EPISODE 3, LLC d/b/a STRIVEPATH..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/06 11:59 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brooke Daly, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by EPISODE 3, LLC d/b/a STRIVEPATH..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/06 11:57 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advantage College Planning Franchising, Inc., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by EPISODE 3, LLC d/b/a STRIVEPATH..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/06 11:56 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Advantage College Planning, LLC, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by EPISODE 3, LLC d/b/a STRIVEPATH..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney Tue 05/06 11:26 AM
AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 10:58 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EPISODE 3, LLC d/b/a STRIVEPATH..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/06 10:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 10:52 AM
COMPLAINT against ADVANTAGE COLLEGE PLANNING FRANCHISING, INC., ADVANTAGE COLLEGE PLANNING, LLC, BROOKE DALY, TRAVIS DALY. Document filed by EPISODE 3, LLC d/b/a STRIVEPATH..(Bloom, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit STRIVEPATH Certificate of Registration
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 05/06 2:25 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Brian Allen Bloom. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: ALL PARTIES. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/06 2:37 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 05/06 2:37 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/06 2:37 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]