Original Case: 1:23-cv-00270

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv.pr-01499
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:34 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
HENDERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By
Sean Francis Perrin
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT JORDAN WARREN, Sheriff Deputy with Henderson County Sheriff's Office - Patrol Division
Represented By
Sean Francis Perrin
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL SCOTT LINDSAY, Sheriff Deputy with Henderson County Sheriff's Office - Patrol Division
Represented By
Sean Francis Perrin
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CRYSTAL D. LANDERS, Sheriff Deputy with Henderson County Sheriff's Office - Patrol Division
Represented By
Sean Francis Perrin
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHNNY E. DUNCAN, JR., Henderson County Director of Technical Services/Public Information Officer
Represented By
Sean Francis Perrin
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRADLEY R. REECE, Animal Enforcement Officer with Henderson County Sheriff's Department
Represented By
Sean Francis Perrin
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRITTANY NICOLE MAYBIN, Detention Facility Officer with Henderson County Detention Facility
Represented By
Sean Francis Perrin
WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SUSAN N. OATES, Magistrate with North Carolina Administrative Office of the Courts
Represented By
Elizabeth Curran O'Brien
NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
EMILY GREENE COWAN, District Court Judge with the North Carolina Consolidated Judicial Retirement System
Represented By
Elizabeth Curran O'Brien
NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MACKENZIE ELAINE BROWN
Represented By
Mackenzie Elaine Brown
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 4:15 AM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:23-cv-00270-MR-WCM. Case manager: AWalker. [1001764727] 25-1499 AW [Entered: 05/05/2025 11:28 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Brown. [1001764732] Informal Opening Brief due 05/29/2025 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 25-1499 AW [Entered: 05/05/2025 11:31 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs RECORD requested from Clerk of Court [1001764733]. Due: 05/19/2025. 25-1499 AW [Entered: 05/05/2025 11:32 AM]
Related: [-]