Original Case: 1:24-cv-01155

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01762
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 3:34 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
CITY OF BLOOMINGTON, ILLINOIS
Represented By
Matthew A. Warner
QUINN JOHNSTON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS DOAGE, Police Officer, in their individual and official capacity
Represented By
Matthew A. Warner
QUINN JOHNSTON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEFF LINDEN, Police Officer, in their individual and official capacity
Represented By
Matthew A. Warner
QUINN JOHNSTON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TAYLOR HALLATT, Police Officer, in their individual and official capacity
Represented By
Matthew A. Warner
QUINN JOHNSTON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JERRAD FREEMAN, Police Officer, in their individual and official capacity
Represented By
Matthew A. Warner
QUINN JOHNSTON
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SPENCER BUSCH, Police Officer, in their individual and official capacity
Represented By
Matthew A. Warner
QUINN JOHNSTON
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
RAKEEM HARRIS
Represented By
Rakeem Harris
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 3:32 AM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Rakeem Harris by 05/12/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/19/2025. Fee or IFP forms due on 05/19/2025 for Appellant Rakeem Harris. [1] [7450368] 25-1762 (JMB) [Entered: 05/05/2025 12:00 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 13 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Fee Notice
Att: 3 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 4 1 pgs Notice to District Court