Original Case: 4:25-cv-00545

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01898
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 3:15 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Access Services Inc.
Plaintiff
Valerie Stephen
Plaintiff - Appellant
Cedric Greene, Jr.
Represented By
Cedric Greene Jr.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 3:15 AM CDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5513560] 25-1898 (RDB)
Related: [-]
14 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 4/23/2025, Order dated 4/23/2025 [5513563] 25-1898 (RDB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER:The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 06/02/2025, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. [5513565] 25-1898 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK ORDER:If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5513568] 25-1898 (RDB)
Related: [-]