Original Case: 1:23-cv-22953

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-prici-11524
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellant
PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
Gary John Guzzi
Akerman, LLP
contact info
Antonio D. Morin
Akerman, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
KEVIN COLLAZO
Represented By
Stephen Anthony Marino Jr.
Ver Ploeg & Marino, PA
contact info
Rochelle Wimbush
Ver Ploeg & Marino, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 4:16 AM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Progressive Select Insurance Company on 05/02/2025. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/23/2025 as to Appellant Progressive Select Insurance Company. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/02/2025 as to Appellee Kevin Collazo.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 11 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs USDC Judgment DE# 91
Att: 4 5 pgs USDC Order DE# 115
Att: 5 2 pgs USDC Order Amended Judgment DE# 108