California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:24-cr-00487
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 12:31 AM PDT
Defendant
James Paul Walsh (1)
Represented By
Seth Dadlani Morris
Cooper Law Offices
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Zachary McCandless Glimcher
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2024
Stipulated ORDER Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to James Paul Walsh. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/30/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:48 AM PDT
Thursday, September 05, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to James Paul Walsh (1), on Count(s): 1. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 Sealing Application and Order as to James Paul Walsh. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/05/24. (jlm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]