Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Ashely M Chan
Case #: 2:25-bk-11778
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
J McCloud Realty LLC
4607 Miller St
Wahiawa, HI 96786-7520
Represented By
MICHAEL I. ASSAD
Sadek Law Offices, LLC
contact info
BRAD J. SADEK
Sadek Law Offices, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107
Represented By
JOHN HENRY SCHANNE
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 6:17 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
18 18 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Fri 05/09 4:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by J McCloud Realty LLC Represented by MICHAEL I. ASSAD Related [+] Proofs of Claims due by 7/15/2025. Government Proof of Claim Deadline: 11/3/2025. (KB)
Related: [-] 7
17 17 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (multi) Fri 05/09 12:48 PM
Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/16/2025 at 02:00 PM at ALTERNATE TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE (For Trustee Use Only). (MILLER, NANCY)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Employ Fri 05/09 12:19 PM
Application to Employ Sadek Law Offices LLC as Debtor's Attorney Filed by J McCloud Realty LLC Represented by BRAD J. SADEK (Counsel). (SADEK, BRAD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Att: 5 Notice
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
15 15 order Expedite Hearing Fri 05/09 10:41 AM
Order Granting Motion Expedite Hearing Related [+] In Re: (11 Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral , Motion for Relief from Stay ) Hearing scheduled 5/14/2025 at 11:00 AM at Philadelphia Telephone Hearing. (CW)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, May 08, 2025
14 14 answer Objection Thu 05/08 7:44 PM
Objection to Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral filed by Creditor Philadelphia Federal Credit Union, Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by J McCloud Realty LLC Related [+]. (ASSAD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 11
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Proposed Order
13 13 plan Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Thu 05/08 7:41 PM
Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Filed by J McCloud Realty LLC. (ASSAD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Expedite Hearing Thu 05/08 12:45 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] Filed by Philadelphia Federal Credit Union Represented by WILLIAM J LEVANT (Counsel). (LEVANT, WILLIAM)
Related: [-] Motion to Prohibit Cash Collateral, Motion for Relief From Stay11
Att: 1 Order scheduling expedited hearing
Att: 2 Certificate of Service of Motion to Expedite
11 11 motion Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral Thu 05/08 12:42 PM
Motion to Prohibit Use of Cash Collateral , Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199.00, Filed by Philadelphia Federal Credit Union Represented by WILLIAM J LEVANT (Counsel). (LEVANT, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A, B and C
Att: 2 Exhibit D, E, and F
Att: 3 Exhibit G
Att: 4 Exhibit H
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Att: 6 Certificate of Service
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 12:43 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 25-11778 amc] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A27615846. Fee Amount $ 199.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#11
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
10 10 order Requiring documents for non-individual cases Wed 05/07 9:56 AM
Order Entered the debtor having failed to file or submit with the petition all of the documents required by Fed. R. Bankr.P.1007, It is hereby ORDERED that this case MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE if the documents listed are not filed by deadlines listed. Any request for an extension of time must be filed prior to the expiration of the deadlines listed . Small Business Balance Sheet or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 5/13/2025. Small Business Cash Flow Statement or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 5/13/2025. Small Business Statement of Operations Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 5/13/2025. Small Business Tax Return or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 5/13/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due 5/20/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 5/20/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 5/20/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/20/2025. Schedule D due 5/20/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/20/2025. Schedule G due 5/20/2025. Schedule H due 5/20/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 5/20/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 5/20/2025. (DR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 trustee Acceptance of Appointment Tue 05/06 3:58 PM
Trustee's Acceptance of Appointment Subchapter V Trustee Holly Smith Miller's Acceptance of Appointment and Verified Statement of Disinterestedness . Filed by United States Trustee. (McCollum, Hannah)
Related: [-]
8 8 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee or Subchapter V Trustee Tue 05/06 3:57 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee HOLLY SMITH MILLER, ESQ.. The trustees acceptance and verified statement shall be filed within 7 days of this notice. Filed by United States Trustee. (McCollum, Hannah)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Tue 05/06 1:51 PM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Filed by J McCloud Realty LLC Represented by MICHAEL I. ASSAD (Counsel). (ASSAD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 05/06 1:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with certificate of service by WILLIAM J LEVANT Filed by WILLIAM J LEVANT on behalf of Philadelphia Federal Credit Union. (LEVANT, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Matrix List of Creditors Tue 05/06 1:23 PM
Matrix List of Creditors Filed. Number of pages filed: 1, Filed by BRAD J. SADEK on behalf of J McCloud Realty LLC. (SADEK, BRAD)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Entry of Appearance and Request for Notices (FOR TRUSTEE'S OFFICE ONLY) Tue 05/06 9:43 AM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE AND REQUEST FOR NOTICES, pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rules 2002 and 9010, JOHN HENRY SCHANNE hereby appears in this matter on behalf of the United States trustee for Region 3, and demands that all notices, motions, etc., given or required to be given in this case, and that all papers, etc., served in this case, be given to and served upon me at the address listed on this case party list. Filed by JOHN HENRY SCHANNE on behalf of United States Trustee. (SCHANNE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Resolution Tue 05/06 8:53 AM
Corporate Resolution Filed by MICHAEL I. ASSAD on behalf of J McCloud Realty LLC. (ASSAD, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 05/06 8:52 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by BRAD J. SADEK on behalf of J McCloud Realty LLC. (SADEK, BRAD)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 05/06 8:48 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by J McCloud Realty LLC. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 08/4/2025. Matrix List of Creditors due 05/13/2025. 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due 05/20/2025. Atty Disclosure Statement due 05/20/2025. List of Equity Security Holders due 05/20/2025. Schedules AB-J due 05/20/2025. Small Business Balance Sheet or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 05/20/2025. Small Business Cash Flow Statement or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 05/20/2025. Small Business Tax Return or a Statement Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 05/20/2025. Small Business Statement of Operations Pursuant to 11:1116(B) that no such document has been prepared is due 05/20/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/20/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/20/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/20/2025. (SADEK, BRAD)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 05/06 8:48 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-11778 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A27587442. Fee Amount $1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1