Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:25-cv-00871
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause42:3601 Fair Housing Act
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Terminated:May 08, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 9:04 AM CDT
Defendant
Gina Laforte
Defendant
Xavier University of Louisiana
Plaintiff
Thomas L D'Aquin
2532 South Galvez
New Orleans, LA 70124


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
4 4 motion Reconsideration Thu 05/15 4:26 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; by Thomas L D'Aquin.(cf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EDSS Submission Sheet
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/08 1:46 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that that Plaintiff's2 application is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right to re-file. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 5/8/2025. (pp)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/06 9:06 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thomas L D'Aquin. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (cf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 9:05 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Gina Laforte, Xavier University of Louisiana filed by Thomas L D'Aquin.(cf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet