New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jil Mazer-Marino
Case #: 1:25-bk-42189
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 11, 2025

Debtor
R&J ACQ LLC
107 Utica Ave
Brooklyn, NY 11213-1733
Represented By
R&J ACQ LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Richard J. McCord
Certilman Balin Adler & Hyman 90 Merrick Avenue
East Meadow, NY 11554
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Eastern District of NY (Brooklyn) Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green Room 510
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 12:05 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
utility ~Force Judge Assignment Tue 05/06 11:00 AM
Judge Assigned Due to Prior Filing, Judge Reassigned. (str)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 05/06 10:59 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non Individuals. Fee Amount $ 338 Filed by R&J ACQ LLC (str)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Notice of Deficiency Concerning Requirement of Photo Identification Tue 05/06 11:12 AM
DOCUMENT NOT ATTACHED- DISREGARD. Notice of Deficiency Concerning Requirement of Photo Identification for the Debtor.Debtor(s) Acceptable Photo Identification due by 5/19/2025. (str)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Deficient Filing Chapter 7 Tue 05/06 11:29 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 7: Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 5/5/2025. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 5/5/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 5/5/2025. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 5/5/2025. Statement of Intention due 6/11/2025. Last day to file Section 521(i)(1) documents is 6/20/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Official Form 206Sum due by 5/19/2025. Schedule A/B due 5/19/2025. Schedule D due 5/19/2025. Schedule E/F due 5/19/2025. Schedule G due 5/19/2025. Schedule H due 5/19/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 5/19/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs Non-Ind Form 207 due 5/19/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/19/2025. (str)
Related: [-]